Financial history FRIENDS OF RUSKIN PARK

Charity number: 1166358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £37.98k £30.54k £89.38k £69.36k £30.68k
Total expenditure £29.76k £22.02k £87.31k £60.53k £50.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.64k £1.39k £26.94k £5.00k £4.76k