Financial history FARMER AND LEMMOIN-CANNON CHARITY

Charity number: 1167718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.81k £17.15k £18.73k £23.66k £37.88k
Total expenditure £21.79k £31.75k £14.49k £27.95k £16.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A