Trustees THE DEEPINGS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1166782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET BEARDSHAW Chair 18 October 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CROWLAND
Received: On time
Michael John Parsons Trustee 21 October 2024
None on record
Mary Martin Trustee 16 October 2023
PETERBOROUGH ALMSHOUSE TRUST CIO
Received: On time
David John Perkins Trustee 17 October 2022
None on record
June Wheatcroft Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Stuart Anthony Wilson Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
MR PHIL JONES Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record