Trustees HARLEQUIN CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 1166196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Pearce Chair 14 January 2025
SURREY COUNTY YOUTH WIND ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Lesley Berongoy Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Elizabeth Bathurst Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Frederic Andrew Richardson Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Abigail Victoria White Trustee 25 January 2022
CROSSWAYS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: On time
Mary Burke Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record