Financial history NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE BACH CHOIR SOCIETY

Charity Number: 507520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £28.44k £8.38k £24.66k £26.22k £43.73k
Total expenditure £28.30k £4.18k £20.43k £24.46k £36.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A