LYTHAM ST ANNES CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of three concerts per season Performance of Carols and other works throughout the season by invitation Fund-raising and Social Events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 May 1978: Standard registration
- LSACS (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALVA MARSDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN RICHARD JONES | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA MARLEY | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS RODWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE JOSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDDIE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN BULLICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANKY RODWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.32k | £5.80k | £9.45k | £14.24k | £19.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.83k | £3.40k | £11.88k | £16.20k | £12.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 APRIL 1978 AS AMENDED 24 NOVEMBER 1992, 28 JUNE 1994, 24 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 26 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CHORAL CONCERTS AND ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 MILL LANE
WARTON
PRESTON
PR4 1AQ
- Phone:
- 07713157961
- Email:
- jrj@j2r2r.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window