Financial history ALL SAINTS COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1167987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £22.06k £14.85k £19.24k £32.11k £14.34k
Total expenditure £43.15k £13.89k £21.15k £13.37k £13.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A