Financial history OHOLEI YOSEF YITZCHOK LUBAVITCH SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1168395
Charity reporting is up to date (208 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £260.93k £206.23k £236.53k £227.39k £290.68k
Total expenditure £220.90k £175.09k £210.59k £246.87k £271.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.36k £24.74k £66.16k £58.29k £63.48k