Accounts and annual returns WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 507565
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 August 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 February 2023 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required