Financial history WILMSLOW SYMPHONY ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 507565
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £20.65k £13.84k £6.04k £14.59k £19.62k
Total expenditure £18.88k £13.16k £2.76k £18.37k £18.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A