MUSLIM CHARITIES FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Muslim Charities Forum is an umbrella organisation for Muslim-led international NGOs, based in the UK. Since our inception in 2007 we have promoted collaborative working and knowledge sharing while supporting our member organisations through advocacy, training and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 March 2016: CIO registration
- 31 March 2017: Funds received from 1126638 MUSLIM CHARITIES FORUM
- MCF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moazzam Malik | Chair | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Khalid Javid | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Shahid Bashir | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Javeria Hashmi | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mukhtar Amirali Karim | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Saffa Mir | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
HAMEED AL-ASALY | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Madiha Raza | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
SHUAIB YUSAF | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|||||||
TUFAIL HUSSAIN KHAN | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr HANY Abdel Gawad EL-BANNA | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.27k | £513.02k | £346.79k | £475.74k | £357.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.88k | £237.71k | £503.82k | £450.87k | £350.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £513.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £237.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Mar 2016 as amended on 14 Jul 2022 as amended on 01 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
A. to promote the efficiency and effectiveness of charities (in particular but without limitation muslim led charities) based in the United Kingdom, and the effective use of their charitable resources, in particular but not exclusively by: 1 promoting cooperation and coordination among such charities; 2 providing representation and advocacy on behalf of such charities; 3 providing and exchanging information, guidance, education, training, technical and professional support and assistance; 4 promoting and undertaking research into the efficiency of charities and disseminating the useful results. and 5. Providing services or making grants and donations to assist charities to develop their activities, projects and services or other as the trustees may determine in their absolute discretion from time to time.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Whitehorse Mews
37 Westminster Bridge Road
London
SE1 7QD
- Phone:
- 02033369704
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window