Accounts and annual returns ACCESS IN DUDLEY

Charity number: 1171283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 August 2024 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 February 2023 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required