Financial history ACCESS IN DUDLEY

Charity number: 1171283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.12k £5.67k £3.34k £5.01k £3.20k
Total expenditure £7.21k £4.04k £7.21k £4.18k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A