BUSINESS EMPOWERING EMPLOYMENT PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs programmes to enable 16 - 24 year olds to move forward into further training, education or employment. The programme offers a positive and supportive environment and teaches the young people skills such as leadership, teamwork, communication, interview techniques and how to set goals and set action plans. They are then matched to a volunteer mentor for ongoing support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 09 September 2016: CIO registration
- BEEP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA JANE SAMPSON RVN | Chair | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
OENONE THOMAS | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL JOY TUCKER | Trustee | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £10 | £5 | £78 | £233 | |
|
Total expenditure | £320 | £120 | £41 | £457 | £235 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 18 January 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Sep 2016 as amended on 11 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF [AGE ] LIVING IN [AREA OF BENEFIT] BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop Fleming
Century House
Nicholson Road
TORQUAY
TQ2 7TD
- Phone:
- 07811182067
- Email:
- info@beep-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window