Financial history CONGLETON TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 507707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £795 £487 £1.20k £1.54k £1.15k
Total expenditure £3.53k £1.53k £1.66k £2.62k £3.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A