Financial history LIONS CLUB OF TROWBRIDGE

Charity Number: 1169282
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.98k £1.63k £9.74k £8.99k £12.29k
Total expenditure £7.41k £6.71k £7.09k £10.76k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A