THE CHISLEHURST SOCIETY CIO

Charity Number: 1166276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Chislehurst Society is a voluntary organisation in the heart of the village, striving to bring people together to protect, preserve and enhance where we live.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £100,065
Total expenditure: £132,841

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denise Richmond Trustee 20 November 2024
None on record
Nigel Rowe Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Dale Malcolm Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Stephan Smith JP Trustee 21 September 2021
SOUTH EAST LONDON FAMILY MEDIATION BUREAU
Received: On time
Richard John Green Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Christine Jane Pearson Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
Jeremy Frank St John Dwight Trustee 23 April 2019
None on record
JENNIFER DEARING Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Anne Lamb Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
David Charles Ely JP Trustee 24 April 2018
SPITALFIELDS CRYPT TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH EAST LONDON FAMILY MEDIATION BUREAU
Received: On time
Joanna Dorothea Friel Trustee 24 April 2012
THE CHISLEHURST AND ST PAUL'S CRAY COMMONS CONSERVATORS
Received: On time
THE ASAMAA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £79.41k £96.15k £110.74k £86.79k £100.07k
Total expenditure £81.77k £86.46k £108.15k £121.98k £132.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £17.77k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED 27TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2017 as amended on 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC ENVIRONMENTAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CHISLEHURST
Registration history
  • 07 April 1989 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
3 Queens Passage
Chislehurst
BR7 5AP
Phone:
02084670900