Financial history SAHARA UK

Charity number: 1166494
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.08k £15.47k £12.33k £55.95k £27.15k
Total expenditure £18.77k £9.34k £18.82k £62.70k £27.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A