Financial history SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £36.64k £16.39k £50.55k £84.13k £91.12k
Total expenditure £35.18k £20.31k £45.03k £72.97k £89.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A