Trustees SOUTH YORKSHIRE COUNTY OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 507808

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Elizabeth Cook | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Louise Harrison | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie Drayson | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Susan Stones | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faye Maxwell-Keyes | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Bradbury | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terri-Ann Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Emma Jewison | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Jayne Taggart | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Ann Carpenter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lynne Moisley-Stuart | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Tate | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mary-Anne Findlay | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucy Eleanor Szocs | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Rachel Morley | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Judith Kate Pleuvry | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sara Adams | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Elizabeth Evison | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Kerrigan | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.