Financial history ROMSEY MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1167471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.72k £4.23k £7.36k £13.71k £8.60k
Total expenditure £3.68k £5.65k £6.24k £12.04k £8.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A