CONTEMPORARY ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's objectives are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education in the Arts generally, for the benefit of the public and in particular, to achievethese ends by: a)-the encouragement of sculpture, painting, drawing, design, lithography, print making, graphics, poetry, literature, film, photography and music b) the advancement of skill and craftsmanship therein
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM ROBERTSON TAYLOR | Chair | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Unwin | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Franses | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15k | £489 | £424 | £224 | £224 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £1.40k | £1.40k | £698 | £517 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS GENERALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ENCOURAGE THE ARTS AND THEIR DEVELOPMENT WITHIN SOCIETY AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SCULPTURE, PAINTING, DRAWING, DESIGN, LITHOGRAPHY, PRINTMAKING, GRAPHICS, POETRY, LITERATURE, FILM, PHOTOGRAPHY AND MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Shaftesbury Way
TWICKENHAM
London
TW2 5RP
- Phone:
- 07778165888
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
contemporaryartstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window