MANGOMA CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support community based NGOs in Global South countries through fundraising and project development, and to facilitate knowledge exchange between these NGOs and equivalent organisations in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 21 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Joan Segrave Kovacs | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Mahamah | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Theodoraki | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ARTHUR WISEMAN MA | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Louise Clare Richmond MA | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE ELIZABETH GRACE WILLIS MA | Trustee | 20 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £500 | £19.56k | £7.67k | £7.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £528 | £1.05k | £12.49k | £7.06k | £5.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS 3.1 THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 3.1.1 TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 3.1.3 TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING UNDER THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (ONE OF THE DESCRIPTIONS OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN S. 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011) INCLUDING THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION, THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING, THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR, THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES, THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF CHARITIES CONCERNED WITH SOCIAL INVESTMENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3.1.4 TO ADVANCE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 3.2 THE CIO WILL ACHIEVE THOSE OBJECTS BY: 3.2.1 SOURCING AND/OR PROVIDING GRANTS TO NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS (NGOS) UNDERTAKING CHARITABLE PROJECTS THAT WILL BENEFIT DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN THEIR LOCALITY; 3.2.2 SUPPORTING NGOS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPACITY TO BE SELF-SUFFICIENT AND ENABLING THEM TO DELIVER SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITY PROJECTS THAT WILL PROVIDE LASTING IMPROVEMENTS IN THOSE COMMUNITIES; 3.2.3 FACILITATING THE EXCHANGE OF KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE RELATING TO COMMUNITY BASED SOLUTIONS BETWEEN NGOS OPERATING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND UK BASED COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES; 3.2.4 UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AND PROVIDING SUCH OTHER SERVICES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE TO PURSUING THE CIOS CHARITABLE PURPOSES. 3.3 IN THESE OBJECTS: 3.3.1 “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; 3.3.2 NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATION (OR NGO) MEANS ANY NOT-FOR-PROFIT VOLUNTARY CITIZENS' GROUP OPERATING INDEPENDENTLY OF GOVERNMENT FOR COMMUNITY OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND ORGANIZED ON A LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL LEVEL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 YORK STREET
NORWICH
NR2 2AR
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- office@mangoma.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window