Financial history ST JUST AND DISTRICT TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1168852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £11.55k £251.16k £23.59k £2.86k £13.38k
Total expenditure £7.53k £207.54k £32.61k £2.83k £12.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £84
Income from government grants £5.00k £61.58k N/A N/A £10.00k