Financial history THE CARDIFF WHALES SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 507932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.95k £5 £740 £6.00k £1.11k
Total expenditure £2.46k £0 £1.41k £2.00k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A