Financial history HARRY FIELDSEND HAWLEY RESIDUARY FUND

Charity number: 507974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.61k £3.69k £6.46k £4.19k £5.61k
Total expenditure £8.06k £4.43k £8.06k £4.60k £4.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A