THE KEW GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kew Guild has three objectives, the advancement of horticultural, mycological and botanical knowledge; the encouragement and advancement of horticultural and botanical education including the provision of awards, prizes and grants to schools and students; to promote the improvement, preservation and sound management of places of natural beauty, gardens and lands of horticultural interest
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Brett | Chair | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Allen | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edward Milbank Pickering | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hindmarch | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Silke Strickrodt | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brita Ruth Elisabeth Freiin Von Hoverbeck Genannt von Schoenaich | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barley | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Chris David Andrew Kidd | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.22k | £56.31k | £35.26k | £65.48k | £76.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.19k | £49.75k | £54.24k | £110.13k | £30.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jul 2017 as amended on 17 Sep 2021 as amended on 30 Sep 2021 as amended on 22 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SKILLS, KNOWLEDGE AND PROFESSIONAL OPPORTUNITIES IN THE HORTICULTURAL AND BOTANICAL SCIENCES. SEE BYELAWS FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Botanic Gardens
The Herbarium
Kew Green
RICHMOND
Surrey
TW9 3AE
- Phone:
- 07850 231497
- Email:
- secretary@kewguild.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window