Trustees THE HEDINGHAM SINGERS
Charity number: 1167081

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JOHN LILLEY | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Cooper | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Baker | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS YOUNG | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lilley | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
HOWARD JAMES STANLEY | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Stanley | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PRIM RAYNER | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
SUSAN FRANCES LEVETT | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH KARBY-BEST | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.