THE BRITISH FOUNDATION FOR THE STUDY OF AZERBAIJAN AND THE CAUCASUS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Non active
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Azerbaijan
Governance
- 27 September 2016: Standard registration
- 24 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 28 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (I) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION ON THE SUBJECT OF PRE-MODERN HISTORY AND CULTURE OF THE CAUCASUS WITH A FOCUS ON AZERBAIJAN; AND (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE CAUCASUS WITH A FOCUS ON AZERBAIJAN, BY RAISING FUNDS AND MAKING GRANTS OR PROVIDING OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PROMOTE INITIATIVES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MAKING DONATIONS TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE PROGRAMME, THE ANGLO-AZERBAIJANI SOCIETY AND THE CENTRE (THE 'OBJECTS').
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window