Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST DAVID, FLEETWOOD
Charity number: 1168745

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Downes | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Swarbrick | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Stead | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Di Graveston | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HILARY CRAIG optional | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EASTWOOD optional | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.