Financial history THE MANSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1168888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.61k £20.98k £26.69k £31.58k £40.72k
Total expenditure £138.97k £118.19k £100.11k £310.26k £175.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A