Financial history SUNSHINE HOUSE WIGAN

Charity number: 1169676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £268.35k £216.50k £214.80k £272.73k £428.41k
Total expenditure £290.05k £202.37k £236.64k £264.79k £443.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £91.08k £24.00k £1.74k £8.02k