SUNSHINE HOUSE WIGAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's purposes are to benefit the residents of Wigan by bringing together these residents with local authority, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,021 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 14 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gower | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|||||
James Holt | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cloe Heaton | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stuart Hodson | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Fox | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Smith | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Fox | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.35k | £216.50k | £214.80k | £272.73k | £428.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.05k | £202.37k | £236.64k | £264.79k | £443.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £91.08k | £24.00k | £1.74k | £8.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SCHOLES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF WIGAN, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunshine House
Wellington Street
Scholes
WIGAN
WN1 3SA
- Phone:
- 01942820026
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window