THE RAILWAY CORRESPONDENCE AND TRAVEL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the knowledge of the public on historic and current railway operations via the publication of a monthly magazine, its website, library/archive centre, photographic collection and the publishing of informative railway books on all railway aspects. To organise localised meetings covering presentations of railway related subjects and visits to railway establishments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul John Chancellor | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Cross | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Leslie Morris | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Milne | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Bird | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
IRENE LOUISE RABBITTS | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STANLEY ROBINSON | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN REDGATE | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|||||
ANDREW PAUL DAVIES | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PETER GODDARD FMAAT | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR REGINALD WOOD | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.47k | £76.33k | £89.52k | £81.69k | £77.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.55k | £73.13k | £86.07k | £76.44k | £89.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF HISTORIC AND CURRENT RAILWAY OPERATION AND RAILWAY HERITAGE, INCLUDING BY: 1. THE PUBLICATION OF A REGULAR MONTHLY MAGAZINE, THE RAILWAY OBSERVER; AND ASSOCIATED WEBSITES 2. THE PUBLICATION OF BOOKS CONTAINING DETAILED HISTORICAL RECORDS RELATING TO RAILWAYS, INCLUDING LOCOMOTIVE CLASSES, TRACTION EQUIPMENT AND RAILWAY INFRASTRUCTURE; 3. THE FORMATION AND SUPPORT OF LOCAL BRANCHES OF THE SOCIETY WITH A VIEW TO PROVIDING A PROGRAMME OF SPEAKERS AND VISITS SO AS TO ENABLE THE PUBLIC TO STUDY AND UNDERSTAND VARIOUS ASPECTS OF THE PRACTICE OF HISTORIC AND CURRENT RAILWAY OPERATION AND RAILWAY HERITAGE; 4. THE DEVELOPMENT AND CONSERVATION OF AN EXTENSIVE LIBRARY/ARCHIVAL CENTRE SO AS TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF HISTORIC AND CURRENT RAILWAY PRACTICE AND RAILWAY HERITAGE; 5. THE DISSEMINATION TO THE PUBLIC OF PHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGES OF HISTORIC AND CURRENT RAILWAY OPERATION AND RAILWAY HERITAGE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS OBJECTS CLAUSE ‘RAILWAY’ INCLUDES: 1. STANDARD, BROAD, NARROW AND MINIATURE GAUGE RAILWAYS 2. URBAN, METRO, LIGHT RAPID TRANSIT AND TRAMWAYS 3. MAINLINE AND PRESERVED RAILWAYS 4. ANY RAILWAY IN THE WORLD THOUGH PRINCIPALLY IN GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND. ‘SOCIETY’ MEANS THE RAILWAY CORRESPONDENCE AND TRAVEL SOCIETY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Daylesford Close
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL51 6DH
- Phone:
- 01242 516747
- Email:
- secretary@rcts.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window