Financial history SAMARITANS OF HORSHAM AND CRAWLEY

Charity Number: 1168031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.80k £37.96k £45.37k £56.81k £45.95k
Total expenditure £42.43k £34.34k £36.90k £48.04k £58.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A