SAMARITANS OF HORSHAM AND CRAWLEY

Charity Number: 1168031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We offer support to people who are suicidal or despairing, and are on hand 24 hours a day, every day of the year, both locally to Horsham, Crawley and the surrounding area, and nationally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £45,951
Total expenditure: £58,714

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Magali Colicchio Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Simon James Bacon Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Susan Ann Kowszun Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Alison Jane Cogle Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Graham Robert John Lilburn Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Anne Tafler Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Jason Holland Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Denis Shakesheff Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.80k £37.96k £45.37k £56.81k £45.95k
Total expenditure £42.43k £34.34k £36.90k £48.04k £58.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 6 APRIL 1973, AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1994, 14 JULY 2004, 30 MAY 2006 AND 20 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN HORSHAM AND CRAWLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
HORSHAM AND CRAWLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA)
Registration history
  • 04 May 1973 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
21 DENNE ROAD
HORSHAM
RH12 1JE
Phone:
01403270027