BEESTON DEMENTIA FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run Memory Cafe sessions: All Thursdays of each month between 2.00-4.00pm. Cafe session programmes provide the opportunity for guests and their supporters to engage in a wide range of arts, cultural and social activities, often led by professional facilitators. Offer information and support on dementia and signposting to specialist organisations/services. Run Dementia Friends awareness sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £2,440 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 October 2016: CIO registration
- Beeston Memory Café (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Alan Burnett BEM | Chair | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stack | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alanna Higgins | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Haskey | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Walsh | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Allsebrook | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Burnett | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Kenyon | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PRICKARD | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN GAVIGAN | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £9.15k | £15.60k | £9.24k | £14.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £8.54k | £10.19k | £14.84k | £15.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £5.74k | £8.75k | £1.12k | £2.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Oct 2016 as amended on 13 Aug 2024 as amended on 16 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TOGETHER WITH THEIR CARERS LIVING IN BEESTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING EDUCATION, TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE, SOCIAL EVENTS AND OUTINGS AT REGULAR SESSIONS, AND TO HAVE A RESOURCE OF ACTIVITIES WHICH PROVIDE STIMULATION FOR THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TO HELP IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THEM AND THEIR CARERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 THE PARKES BUILDING
THE POPLARS
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2UY
- Phone:
- 07846403342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window