SADIE SMULOVITCH CHILDREN'S TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1168968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING GRANTS, CLOTHING, SHOES OR OTHER ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED OR TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £59,290
Total expenditure: £188,935

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SSCT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EPHRAIM MEIR PEARLMAN Chair 11 April 2016
None on record
Jacob Dunner Trustee 05 April 2024
None on record
Michael Dunner Trustee 05 April 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £90.96k £86.32k £221.65k £159.90k £59.29k
Total expenditure £92.87k £81.26k £100.21k £144.06k £188.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 02 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 WINDERMERE STREET
GATESHEAD
NE8 1TU
Phone:
01914402335
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available