THE FATHERS' DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the mental health of parents particularly, but not exclusively, of fathers, and to promote and protect the good health both physical and mental of children in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane Richard Ryan | Chair | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Rallings | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yansie Rolston | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|||||
LALITA TAYLOR | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50.05k | £64 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78k | £1.76k | £1.05k | £3.14k | £36.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2024 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 November 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 November 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF PARENTS PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF FATHERS, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL OF CHILDREN IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (1) ADVANCING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF THE ROLE OF FATHERS IN CHILDREN’S DEVELOPMENT, MENTAL HEALTH AND FUTURE LIFE CHANCES; (2) ENHANCING UNDERSTANDING OF HOW PARENTS, PARTICULARLY FATHERS, CAN BE SUPPORTED IN THEIR PARENTING, AND PROMOTING THE ACQUISITION OF PARENTAL KNOWLEDGE, CAPABILITIES AND SKILLS, PARTICULARLY IN FATHERS, THAT FOSTER COMPETENT, NURTURING AND EQUAL PARENTING; AND (3) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO INFLUENCES ON PARENTS, PARTICULARLY ON FATHERS, AND PARENTAL INFLUENCES ON CHILDREN, AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167 Hospital Bridge Road
TWICKENHAM
TW2 6LE
- Phone:
- 07948740166
- Email:
- info@fathersdevelopment.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window