Financial history DOVER OUTREACH CENTRE

Charity number: 1168737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £249.38k £246.21k £691.71k £845.39k £736.82k
Total expenditure £215.90k £246.51k £591.22k £653.93k £812.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.63k £11.36k £207.09k £136.26k £183.91k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £492.56k £469.61k £309.34k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £199.15k £342.84k £418.10k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £32.94k £9.38k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £591.22k £653.93k £812.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £28.10k £9.00k £16.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0