SONG AND HYMN WRITERS FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- writing and publishing new songs and hymns through the Resound Worship and Jubilate labels - discovering and nurturing new song and hymn writers and publishing their work - educating and encouraging song and hymn writers through workshops, resources and events - influencing the wider Christian music publishing industry through work in partnership with other organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Germany
- Netherlands
- United States
Governance
- 30 November 2016: CIO registration
- 02 November 2018: Funds received from 1040830 JUBILATE HYMNS CHARITABLE TRUST
- Jubilate (Working name)
- Resound Worship (Working name)
- JUBILATE AND RESOUND WORSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON CHRISTOPHER UPCOTT FCA BFP | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Matthew Swires-Hennessy | Trustee | 08 March 2023 | ||||||||
Nina Kurlberg | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Alex Guest | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ANNE HARRISON | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.26k | £76.48k | £103.54k | £98.23k | £132.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.56k | £66.59k | £79.73k | £100.74k | £133.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN SCHEDULE 2, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) BY FURTHERING THE GROWTH OF WRITING, COMPOSING AND USE OF HYMNS AND SONGS. (B) BY PROVIDING RESOURCES TO ASSIST CHURCH MUSICIANS IN DEVELOPING THE USE OF OTHER MUSIC FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND THEREBY TO SUPPORT PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL IN CHURCHES, CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS AND GATHERINGS OF A SIMILAR NATURE (C) BY DEVELOPING HYMNS, SONGS AND OTHER MUSIC FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING THE EFFECTIVENESS OF SUCH WORSHIP. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE WRITING OF HYMNS, SONGS AND OTHER WORDS AND MUSIC FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND IN HIGH STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE BOTH FOR NEW AND EXISTING WRITERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL EVENTS AND RESOURCES TO ENHANCE AND IMPROVE THE COMPOSITION OF WORDS AND MUSIC FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP (B) BY MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO MAKE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES MORE ACCESSIBLE TO WRITERS OF CHRISTIAN MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Hastings Road
Woodhouse Eaves
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 8QU
- Phone:
- 01509 891429
- Email:
- info@shwf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window