KINVER COMMUNITY LIBRARY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate library and associated services at Kinver Library, Vicarage Drive, Kinver DY7 6HJ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Rose Allen | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Amanda Alice Thomson | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Robinson Sadler | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Anthony Stephenson | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL ARTHUR WOODDISSE FCA | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||||
VALERIE MONA DAVIS | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
KATHERINE MARION DIXSON | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW MICHAEL GARY CALLOWAY | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | £2.94k | £4.43k | £3.74k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.49k | £3.81k | £2.89k | £3.26k | £2.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGE OF KINVER, STOURBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGE OF KINVER, STOURBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR RECREATION AND OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE VILLAGE OF KINVER, STOURBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A LENDING LIBRARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Chantry Road
Stourton
Stourbridge
DY7 6SA
- Phone:
- 01384372184
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window