Accounts and annual returns I HAVE A FATHER

Charity number: 1169643
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2025 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2025 346 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2025 711 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 January 2025 711 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2022 416 days late