Financial history I HAVE A FATHER

Charity number: 1169643
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £135 £50 £155 £5 £0
Total expenditure £96 £49 £45 £41 £33
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A