Financial history TRANS4M INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1172041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £133.80k £101.87k £98.88k £61.28k £59.93k
Total expenditure £159.73k £137.22k £109.83k £81.96k £64.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A