Financial history COMPANY THREE THEATRE

Charity number: 1169024
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £278.85k £376.92k £289.16k £217.63k £526.43k
Total expenditure £272.45k £302.68k £350.68k £240.68k £457.66k
Income from government contracts £6.00k £5.90k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k £7.50k £190.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £478.69k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £701
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.85k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £457.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0