Financial history HESKIN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 508628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.84k £18.71k £9.07k £9.11k £13.80k
Total expenditure £8.25k £28.27k £6.99k £10.27k £20.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.74k £16.10k N/A N/A £500