THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HANDSWORTH, ST MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the Parish Church for the Established Church of England in the Parish of Handsworth, Birmingham. We offer religious worship, instruction and pastoral support to the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 January 2017: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S, HANDSWORTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raj Mahay | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cindi Hofton | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thaddeus Okwuchukwu Ede | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Delia Arnold | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruth Cooper | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Mujabi Senteza | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARIE JEAN SEADON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAMELIA GEORGINA STONEMAN PATON-DEVINE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEONIE KAREN COLWILL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WILLIAM WALTERS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
EUREKA DRAYTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN PATON-DEVINE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT FITZROY DANIEL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ETHEL VERONICA LUBIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HAZELEY-JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID LESLIE HOLMES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
KEITH HEMMINGS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
EDNA JOAN SIMKIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HERBERT LEAR OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHANE O TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA ALLISON DUGGAN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN GLADYS HEMMINGS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.52k | £87.59k | £87.79k | £132.21k | £124.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £360.12k | £77.44k | £106.35k | £90.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2023 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2023 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH: PASTORAL; EVANGELISTIC; SOCIAL; AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
288 HAMSTEAD ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2RB
- Phone:
- 01215543407
- Email:
- rector@handsworthstmary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window