THE DONCASTER CIVIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes interest in and care for the environment by lectures, occasional visits and exhibitions, and the issue of a regular newsletter. Maintains a close watch on, and makes representations on proposals affecting historic buildings and areas. Promotes education in the built and natural environment with a programme of student bursaries and funding for post-graduate student and school projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 03 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Paul Hayles | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Clark Carpenter | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ian Walker | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Glazzard | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Anne Mellows | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Waterhouse | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANN FEVRE | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KIMBER | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL MARTIN COOTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN EDWARD MUNSON LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA REJANDA ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY BURLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET HERBERT | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANTHONY WRIGGLESWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY BARNSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARCHIBALD MALIN SINCLAIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.24k | £10.78k | £12.36k | £13.32k | £14.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £6.05k | £8.68k | £15.83k | £10.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4 APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BOUNTY BOROUGH OF DONCASTER AND ADJACENT DISTRICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 ELLERS AVENUE
DONCASTER
DN4 7DY
- Phone:
- 01302538225
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window