Financial history ITESO WELFARE ASSOCIATION ( IWA )

Charity number: 1170126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.10k £11.09k £11.09k £3.45k £1.96k
Total expenditure £6.33k £8.38k £8.38k £3.33k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A